WA SB5694 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning commercial beekeeper drivers.
Title
Concerning commercial beekeeper drivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |