WA SB5695 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning high occupancy vehicle lane penalties.
Title
Concerning high occupancy vehicle lane penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 467, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 35; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-27 | House | Committee amendment |
2019-04-27 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-08 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-08 | House | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-12 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1710 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.