WA SB5700 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring training for long-term care providers on the needs of the LGBTQ population.
Title
Requiring training for long-term care providers on the needs of the LGBTQ population.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] |
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-23 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Held on calendar. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |