WA SB5709 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the Native American opportunity scholarship program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the Native American opportunity scholarship program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-19SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-19SenateHEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-29SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback