WA SB5710 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the active transportation safety advisory council.
Title
Establishing the active transportation safety advisory council.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Sen. Andrew Billig [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 54, 2019 Laws PV. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-21 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1723 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.