WA SB5714 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the reliability of evidence in criminal proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the reliability of evidence in criminal proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-09SenateChapter 359, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-09SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-26SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-25SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0.
2019-04-25SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-15HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-15HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-15HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-28HousePS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2019-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-21SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-29SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Same As/Similar To

HB1970 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-08 - First reading, referred to Public Safety.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5714&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5714.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5714-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5714-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5714-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118793&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5714&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118793&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5714&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118793&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-25-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5714&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback