WA SB5715 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a streamlined process to increase the capacity of certain mental health providers to offer substance use disorder treatment.
Title
Establishing a streamlined process to increase the capacity of certain mental health providers to offer substance use disorder treatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | BH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 6:00 PM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1729 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.