WA SB5739 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Promoting affordable housing in unincorporated areas of rural counties within urban growth areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting affordable housing in unincorporated areas of rural counties within urban growth areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.
2019-03-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-12Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-01SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-18SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-18SenateHSA - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-13SenatePublic hearing scheduled, but not heard in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-30SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability.

Same As/Similar To

HB1790 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-14 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback