WA SB5741 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 5/8/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Making changes to support future operations of the state all payer claims database by transferring the responsibility to the health care authority, partnering with a lead organization with broad data experience, including with self-insured employers, and other changes to improve and ensure successful and sustainable database operations for access to and use of the data to improve health care, providing consumers useful and consistent quality and cost measures, and assess total cost of care in Washington state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making changes to support future operations of the state all payer claims database by transferring the responsibility to the health care authority, partnering with a lead organization with broad data experience, including with self-insured employers, and other changes to improve and ensure successful and sustainable database operations for access to and use of the data to improve health care, providing consumers useful and consistent quality and cost measures, and assess total cost of care in Washington state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateEffective date 5/8/2019.
2019-05-08SenateChapter 319, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-08SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-27SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-26SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-04-26SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-24HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-04-24HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-24HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-24HouseReturned to second reading for amendment.
2019-04-24HouseRules suspended.
2019-04-24HouseHouse receded from amendments.
2019-04-19SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
2019-04-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-16HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-15HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-27HouseITED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.
2019-03-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-13SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-13Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-09SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-01SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health & Long Term Care.
2019-03-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-19SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-19SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 5:30 PM.
2019-02-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-30SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Same As/Similar To

HB1776 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5741&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5741.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5741-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5741-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5741-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5741-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118876&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-13-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5741&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118876&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-16-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5741&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118876&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-24-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5741&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118876&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5741&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback