WA SB5746 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for adequate provisions for low-income homeownership opportunities.
Title
Providing for adequate provisions for low-income homeownership opportunities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2019-03-27 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-13 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | HSA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1834 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.