WA SB5749 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning faith-based exemptions regarding criminal mistreatment of children and vulnerable adults.
Title
Concerning faith-based exemptions regarding criminal mistreatment of children and vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1376 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.