WA SB5751 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning motorized foot scooters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning motorized foot scooters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-03-18SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-28SenateTRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-30SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB1772 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback