WA SB5765 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a new exclusion from mandatory industrial insurance coverage for persons transporting freight. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Clarifying responsibilities for mandatory industrial insurance coverage for persons transporting freight. )

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a new exclusion from mandatory industrial insurance coverage for persons transporting freight. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Clarifying responsibilities for mandatory industrial insurance coverage for persons transporting freight. )

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-02HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-26HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2019-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-08Senate1st substitute bill not substituted.
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-21SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-21SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-21SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-31SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback