WA SB5774 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Relieving student debt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relieving student debt.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-28HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-28HouseCWD - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-27HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-08HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.
2019-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-19SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-19SenateHEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-31SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback