WA SB5779 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: House State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: House State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ballot drop box placement requirements.
Title
Concerning ballot drop box placement requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-13 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 5:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |