WA SB5784 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Advancing the regional ocean partnership.
Title
Advancing the regional ocean partnership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-05-03 | Chapter 250, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-03 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-20 | President signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2011-04-19 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2011-04-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 78; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-05 | Floor amendment | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-03-24 | ENVI - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-24 | ENVI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-03-11 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-03 | First reading, referred to Environment. | |
2011-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-21 | NRMW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-21 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-11 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Marine Waters. |