WA SB5789 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing additional uses for automated traffic safety cameras for traffic congestion reduction and increased safety.
Title
Establishing additional uses for automated traffic safety cameras for traffic congestion reduction and increased safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1793 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.