WA SB5792 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Making statutory requirements and policies for cultural access programs the same in all counties of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making statutory requirements and policies for cultural access programs the same in all counties of the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27SenateEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-27SenateChapter 192, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-27SenateGovernor signed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-11SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-09SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2020-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-06HouseFloor amendment
2020-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-27HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-25HouseHOUS - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-21HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-23HouseFirst reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans.
2020-01-22HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2020-01-21HousePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-03-29HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-26HouseHOUS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans.
2019-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-13SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-12SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-12SenateLGOV - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-12SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:30 AM.
2019-02-01SenateFirst reading, referred to Local Government.

Same As/Similar To

HB1435 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - House Rules "X" file.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5792&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5792.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5792.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5792.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119015&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5792&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119015&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=01-22-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5792&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119015&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5792&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119015&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5792&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback