WA SB5795 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing contractor bonding requirements.
Title
Increasing contractor bonding requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 155, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-21 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1752 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.