WA SB5800 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning homeless college students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning homeless college students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-09SenateChapter 330, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-09SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-27SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-26SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-26SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-12HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-06HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-06HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-26HouseCWD - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-08HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.
2019-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-26SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-19SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-19SenateHEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-07SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-01SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.

Same As/Similar To

HB1572 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Appropriations.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5800&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5800.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5800-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5800-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5800-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5800-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119048&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5800&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119048&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5800&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119048&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5800&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback