WA SB5805 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning projects of statewide significance for economic development and transportation.
Title
Concerning projects of statewide significance for economic development and transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | TRED - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 5:30 PM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5805&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5805.pdf |