WA SB5805 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-11 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-11 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the application of landmark or historic preservation regulations with regard to school district property in school districts with more than fifty thousand students.
Title
Concerning the application of landmark or historic preservation regulations with regard to school district property in school districts with more than fifty thousand students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5805&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5805.pdf |