WA SB5805 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Making state law consistent with selected federal consumer protections in the patient protection and affordable care act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making state law consistent with selected federal consumer protections in the patient protection and affordable care act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-03-18SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2019-03-09SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-26SenateMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2019-02-21SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-19SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-19SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 5:30 PM.
2019-02-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-04SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Same As/Similar To

HB1870 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Effective date 4/17/2019.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback