WA SB5811 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing emissions by making changes to the clean car standards and clean car program.
Title
Reducing emissions by making changes to the clean car standards and clean car program.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 25 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 143, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 25; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Vote on third reading will be reconsidered. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-20 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2020-01-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1999 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.