WA SB5816 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the valuation and determination of used and useful property for rate making purposes.
Title
Clarifying the valuation and determination of used and useful property for rate making purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-21 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-04-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-26 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1625 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5816&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5816.pdf |