WA SB5826 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Maximizing federal funding for prevention and family services and programs.
Title
Maximizing federal funding for prevention and family services and programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1900 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.