WA SB5830 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning vehicle combinations that may be operated on public highways.
Title
Concerning vehicle combinations that may be operated on public highways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1897 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5830&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5830.pdf |