WA SB5839 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a pilot project to provide personal care services for homeless seniors and persons with disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a pilot project to provide personal care services for homeless seniors and persons with disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-22HouseHSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-20HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 9:00 AM.
2019-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.
2019-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2019-02-21SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-19SenateHSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-13SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:30 AM.
2019-02-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback