WA SB5846 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the integration of international medical graduates into Washington's health care delivery system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the integration of international medical graduates into Washington's health care delivery system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-09SenateChapter 329, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-09SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-27SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-26SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 39; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-26SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-12HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-27HouseHCW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 9:00 AM.
2019-03-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2019-03-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-13Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-28SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-22SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-22SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Same As/Similar To

HB2104 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-21 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5846&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5846.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5846-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5846-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5846-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5846-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119217&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-13-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5846&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119217&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5846&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119217&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5846&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback