WA SB5852 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the lease terms for managing first-class unplatted tidelands and shorelands.
Title
Revising the lease terms for managing first-class unplatted tidelands and shorelands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1849 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5852&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5852.pdf |