WA SB5865 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Declaring October as Filipino American history month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declaring October as Filipino American history month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-07SenateChapter 283, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-07SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-23SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-18SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-27HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2019-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2019-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-21SenateSGTE - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 5:30 PM.
2019-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-07SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback