WA SB5874 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Funding rural satellite skill centers.
Title
Funding rural satellite skill centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Chapter 197, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-04-01 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |