WA SB5881 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Delivered to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing the installation of safety glazing or film sunscreening materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing the installation of safety glazing or film sunscreening materials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-28SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-27SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1.
2019-04-27SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-15HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-15HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-15HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-08HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-03HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-03HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-03HouseTR - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2019-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-27SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5881&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5881.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5881.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119368&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5881&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119368&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5881&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119368&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-27-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5881&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback