WA SB5883 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing vehicles or combinations of vehicles carrying farm products to exceed total gross weight limits by two thousand pounds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing vehicles or combinations of vehicles carrying farm products to exceed total gross weight limits by two thousand pounds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-21SenateChapter 439, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-30SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-28SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-27SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-27SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-15HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-15HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-15HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-08HouseTR - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM.
2019-04-03HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2019-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-27SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-27SenateTRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5883&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5883.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5883-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5883-S.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119370&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5883&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119370&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5883&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119370&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-27-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5883&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback