WA SB5899 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sales and use tax for public facilities in rural or border counties.
Title
Concerning sales and use tax for public facilities in rural or border counties.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Douglas Ericksen [R] |
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | FIET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |