WA SB5900 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting access to earned benefits and services for lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, and queer veterans.
Title
Promoting access to earned benefits and services for lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, and queer veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 56, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-29 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |