WA SB5908 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing training for equity and cultural competency in the public school system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing training for equity and cultural competency in the public school system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReturned to Senate Rules 3.
2020-02-27HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2020-02-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2020-02-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-12SenateFloor amendment
2020-02-12Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-11SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-10SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-10SenateWM - Majority; without recommendation.
2020-02-10SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-07SenateOn motion, referred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-07SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-07SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-02-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Same As/Similar To

HB1914 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback