WA SB5918 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing whale watching guidelines in the boating safety education program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing whale watching guidelines in the boating safety education program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-08SenateChapter 293, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-08SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-22SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-12HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-04-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-02HouseRDAN - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-27HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.
2019-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-28SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-21SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-21SenateAWNP - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5918&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5918.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5918.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5918.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119576&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5918&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119576&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5918&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119576&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-22-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5918&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback