WA SB5929 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting the disclosure of names in employment investigation records.
Title
Exempting the disclosure of names in employment investigation records.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] |
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2020 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5929&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5929.pdf |