WA SB5930 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating Seattle Storm special license plates to fund youth leadership and sports programs.
Title
Creating Seattle Storm special license plates to fund youth leadership and sports programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2062 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Effective date 10/1/2019.