WA SB5936 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning use of industrial waste through industrial symbioses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning use of industrial waste through industrial symbioses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2019-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-01SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-20SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-20SenateENET - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Same As/Similar To

HB2079 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-18 - First reading, referred to Environment & Energy.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback