WA SB5942 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the budgeting process for core state services for children.
Title
Concerning the budgeting process for core state services for children.
Sponsors
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2083 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5942&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5942.pdf |