WA SB5947 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the sustainable farms and fields grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the sustainable farms and fields grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03SenateEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-04-03SenateChapter 351, 2020 Laws.
2020-04-03SenateGovernor signed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-10SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 43; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-10SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2020-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 74; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2020-03-04HouseCommittee amendment
2020-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-03HousePlaced on second reading.
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-03-02HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02HouseCB - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Capital Budget.
2020-02-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-28HouseRDAN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-21HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-07HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.
2020-01-15HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-01-13HousePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-03HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-28HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.
2019-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-01SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-22SenateOn motion, referred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-21SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-21SenateAWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.

Same As/Similar To

HB2095 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5947&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5947.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5947-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5947-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5947-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5947-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119710&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5947&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119710&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=01-15-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5947&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119710&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5947&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119710&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5947&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback