WA SB5951 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tax incentives to encourage residential and mixed-use development in urban infill areas.
Title
Concerning tax incentives to encourage residential and mixed-use development in urban infill areas.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] |
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |