WA SB5955 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making necessary changes allowing the department of children, youth, and families to effectively manage a statewide system of care for children, youth, and families.
Title
Making necessary changes allowing the department of children, youth, and families to effectively manage a statewide system of care for children, youth, and families.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] |
Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 470, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee amendment |
2019-03-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-26 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-01 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2063 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.