WA SB5971 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning transportation funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning transportation funding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-07SenateOn motion, referred to Ways & Means.
2019-03-06SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-06SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-06SenateTRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 9:00 AM.
2019-02-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback