WA SB5976 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the access to baby and child dentistry program for children with disabilities.
Title
Concerning the access to baby and child dentistry program for children with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 242, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-29 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |