WA SB5981 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing a greenhouse gas emissions cap and trade program.
Title
Implementing a greenhouse gas emissions cap and trade program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5981&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5981.pdf |