WA SB5986 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a tax on vapor and heated tobacco products to fund cancer research and support local public health.
Title
Establishing a tax on vapor and heated tobacco products to fund cancer research and support local public health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-25 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |