WA SB5996 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Funding fire prevention and suppression activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding fire prevention and suppression activities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28SenateReturned to Rules.
2019-04-27SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-18SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-18SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-04-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-08SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-29SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback